There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995

Short Titles as Introduced

Jerusalem Embassy Relocation Implementation Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the relocation of the United States Embassy in Israel to Jerusalem, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
11/08/1995Became Public Law No: 104-45. (TXT | PDF)
11/08/1995Sent to Archivist of the United States unsigned.
10/26/1995Presented to President.
10/24/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 37, 5 Present (Roll no. 734).
10/24/1995Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 93-5. Record Vote No: 496.
10/13/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
11/08/1995Became Public Law No: 104-45. (TXT | PDF)
11/08/1995Sent to Archivist of the United States unsigned.
10/26/1995SenatePresented to President.
10/24/1995-6:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/24/1995-6:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 37, 5 Present (Roll no. 734).
10/24/1995-5:55pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10691-10692)
10/24/1995-5:17pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/24/1995-4:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/24/1995-4:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10680-10689)
10/24/1995-4:32pmHouseMr. Gilman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/24/1995-4:31pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/24/1995SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/24/1995-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/24/1995SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 93-5. Record Vote No: 496.
10/24/1995SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S15520-15535)
10/23/1995SenateS.Amdt.2941 Amendment SP 2941 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/23/1995SenateS.Amdt.2941 Proposed by Senator Dole. To provide for the establishment of the United States Embassy in Israel in the capital of Jerusalem, and for other purposes.
10/23/1995SenateS.Amdt.2940 Motion to table SP 2940 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51-40. Record Vote No: 495.
10/23/1995SenateS.Amdt.2940 Proposed by Senator Dorgan. To express the sense of the Senate on tax cuts and medicare.
10/23/1995SenateMeasure laid before Senate.
10/18/1995SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
10/13/1995SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/13/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 10/13/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 10/13/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/19/1995
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/19/1995
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/19/1995
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/20/1995
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 10/23/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/23/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/23/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/23/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/23/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/24/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/24/1995
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/24/1995
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/24/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/24/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/24/1995

Committees (0)

As of 08/19/2019 text has not been received for S.1322 - Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1322. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/24/1995)

Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995 - Declares it to be U.S. policy that: (1) Jerusalem remain an undivided city in which the rights of every ethnic religious group are protected; (2) Jerusalem be recognized as the capital of the State of Israel; and (3) the U.S. Embassy in Israel be established in Jerusalem no later than May 31, 1999.

States that, subject to the President's waiver authority granted below, not more than 50 percent of the funds appropriated for FY 1999 to the Department of State for "Acquisition and Maintenance of Buildings Abroad" may be obligated in the fiscal year until the Secretary of State determines, and reports to the Congress, that the Embassy has opened.

Makes specified amounts of such funds available until expended in FY 1996 and 1997 only for construction and other costs associated with relocating the U.S. Embassy Jerusalem.

Requires the Secretary of State to report to the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Committee on Foreign Relations of the Senate on: (1) the Department of State's plan to implement this Act; and (2) progress made toward opening the U.S. Embassy in Jerusalem.

Authorizes the President to suspend for six months (with possible subsequent six-month extensions) the 50 percent limitation on the obligation of funds with respect to the opening of the Embassy if he determines and reports to the Congress that a suspension is necessary to protect the national security interests of the United States.