Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/13/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 10/13/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 10/13/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 10/13/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/19/1995
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/19/1995
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/19/1995
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/20/1995
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 10/23/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/23/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/23/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/23/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/23/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/24/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/24/1995
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/24/1995
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/24/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/24/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/24/1995