Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 12/20/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/30/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/09/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/20/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/23/1996
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/27/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/29/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/16/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/16/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/18/1996