Text: S.1382 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Referred in House (10/04/1996)

 
[Congressional Bills 104th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. 1382 Referred in House (RFH)]







104th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                S. 1382


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            October 4, 1996

          Referred to the Committee on International Relations

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
           To extend the Middle East Peace Facilitation Act.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, That--
    (a) In General.--Section 583(a) of the Foreign Relations 
Authorization Act, Fiscal Years 1994 and 1995 (Public Law 103-236), as 
amended, is amended by striking ``November 1, 1995'' and inserting 
``December 1, 1995''.
    (b) Consultation.--For purposes of any exercise of the authority 
provided in section 583(a) of the Foreign Relations Authorization Act, 
Fiscal Years 1994 and 1995 (Public Law 103-236) prior to November 15, 
1995, the written policy justification dated June 1, 1995, and 
submitted to the Congress in accordance with section 583(b)(1) of such 
Act, and the consultations associated with such policy justification, 
shall be deemed to satisfy the requirements of section 583(b)(1) of 
such Act.

            Passed the Senate November 2, 1995.

            Attest:

                                                    GARY SISCO,

                                                             Secretary.