Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 11/07/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/20/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/20/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/27/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/27/1996
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/30/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/23/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/26/1996
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/12/1996