Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/17/1995
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 11/17/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 11/17/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 11/17/1995
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 11/17/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 11/17/1995
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 11/17/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 11/17/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 12/05/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 12/05/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/05/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/05/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 12/05/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/13/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 12/20/1995
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 12/22/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/05/1996
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 01/23/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/23/1996
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/23/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/25/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/09/1996