Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 01/04/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/04/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/04/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 01/04/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/04/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/06/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/11/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 01/11/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/18/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 01/24/1995
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 02/13/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/09/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/15/1995