Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 12/12/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 12/12/1995
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/13/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 12/13/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 12/14/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 12/21/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/21/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 03/25/1996