Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/20/1995
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 12/20/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 12/20/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 12/20/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/26/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/06/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 03/12/1996
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/12/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/12/1996
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/12/1996
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/28/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/28/1996
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 03/28/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/25/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/25/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/25/1996
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/09/1996
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/20/1996
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/27/1996
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/27/1996
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/22/1996
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 08/02/1996