Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 12/20/1995
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 12/20/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 12/20/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 12/20/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 12/20/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 12/20/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 01/31/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/31/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/31/1996
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/20/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/23/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/27/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/27/1996
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/29/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/29/1996
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/06/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/06/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/06/1996
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 03/26/1996
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/26/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/26/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/26/1996
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/26/1996
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/26/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/26/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/17/1996
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/17/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/17/1996
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/17/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/17/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/25/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/25/1996
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/25/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/15/1996
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 05/15/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/15/1996
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/17/1996
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 05/17/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/17/1996
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/19/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/19/1996
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/19/1996
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/26/1996
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/26/1996
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/22/1996