Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/23/1996
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/23/1996
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/23/1996
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/23/1996
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/23/1996
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/23/1996
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/23/1996
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/23/1996
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/23/1996
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/29/1996
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/13/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/08/1996
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/01/1996
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 08/02/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew