Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 12/22/1995
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 12/22/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 12/22/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 12/22/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 12/22/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/29/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/05/1996
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/05/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/12/1996
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/25/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/29/1996
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/16/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/25/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/18/1996
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/18/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/16/1996