Summary: S.1508 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment (01/02/1996)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Unnamed

Title II: Unnamed

Title III: District of Columbia

Title IV: Veterans Affairs

Title V: Clarification of Certain Reimbursements

Title I - Amends Federal law with respect to the general restriction against acceptance by a Federal or a District of Columbia (D.C.) government officer or employee of voluntary services for either government, or employment of personal services exceeding that authorized by law, except for emergencies involving the safety of human life or the protection of property (essential employees). Deems all Federal and D.C. government officers and employees to be performing such emergency services (thus deeming them all to be essential employees). Amends such law only for the period December 15, 1995, through February 1, 1996.

(Sec. 2) Declares that Federal employees considered exempted from furlough during any period in which there is a lapse in appropriations for the agency activity in which the employee is engaged shall not be considered to be furloughed when on leave and shall be subject to the same leave regulations as if no lapse in appropriations had occurred.

(Sec. 3) Makes eligible for unemployment compensation benefits with no waiting period any Federal employee who, as of January 2, 1996, is excepted from furlough and is not being paid due to a lapse in appropriations.

Title II - Makes continuing appropriations for FY 1996 for certain projects and activities, including the costs of direct loans and loan guarantees (not otherwise specifically provided for in this Act), which were conducted in FY 1995. Specifies among such projects and activities: (1) nutrition services for the elderly; (2) grants to States for child welfare services; (3) Federal Parent Locator Service activities; (4) State unemployment insurance administration activities; (5) general welfare assistance payments and foster care payments; (6) projects and activities necessary to accommodate visitors and to provide for visitor services in the National Park System, the National Wildlife Refuges, the National Forests, and the facilities operated by the Smithsonian Institution, the National Gallery of Art, and the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts; and (7) projects and activities necessary to process passports.

(Sec. 201) Funds such projects and activities at the current rate or the lowest rate enacted by either the House or the Senate in an FY 1996 appropriations Act, whichever is lower.

Title III: District of Columbia - Makes continuing appropriations for FY 1996 for the District of Columbia for certain projects and activities, including the costs of direct loans and loan guarantees (not otherwise specifically provided for in this Act), which were conducted in FY 1995, and for which appropriations, funds, or other authority would be available in the District of Columbia Appropriations Act, 1996.

(Sec. 301) Funds such projects and activities at the current rate or the lowest rate enacted by either the House or the Senate in an FY 1996 appropriations Act, whichever is lower.

(Sec. 307) Prohibits the expenditure of any funds appropriated under this title for any abortion except where the life of the mother would be endangered if the fetus were carried to term, or where the pregnancy is the result of an act of rape or incest.

(Sec. 311) Requires reduction by 25 percent from the current operations rate of funds for certain ongoing projects and activities.

(Sec. 312) States that, whenever the rate for operations for any continuing project or activity for which there is a budget request would result in a furlough of D.C. Government employees, the operations rate may be increased to the minimum level that would enable the furlough to be avoided. Sets such minimum level at 25 percent below the current operations rate for any such project or activity.

(Sec. 315) Declares inapplicable to this Act certain provisions of the District of Columbia Appropriations Act, 1988 stating that the Federal payment to the District of Columbia shall not be subject to apportionment, and shall be paid by a specified deadline.

(Sec. 316) Prohibits the use of funds appropriated under this title to implement any system of registration of unmarried, cohabiting couples, whether homosexual, lesbian, or heterosexual.

Title IV: Veterans Affairs - Makes continuing appropriations, in any case during FY 1996 in which appropriations are not otherwise available for the programs and activities of the Department of Veterans Affairs, to ensure payment of the following: (1) existing veterans benefits; and (2) Veterans Health Administration contractors when due for services provided that relate directly to patient health and safety.

Defines existing benefits as those that have been adjudicated and authorized for payment as of: (1) December 15, 1995; or (2) if appropriations for such benefits are available (other than as provided for above) after December 15, 1995, the last day on which appropriations for payment of such benefits are available.

(Sec. 402) Makes the above provisions of this title ineffective on September 30, 1996.

Title V: Clarification of Certain Reimbursements - Declares that if a State used State funds to continue carrying out a Federal program, or furloughed State employees whose compensation is advanced or reimbursed in whole or in part by the Federal Government, then: (1) such furloughed employees shall be compensated at their standard rate of compensation for such period; (2) the State shall be reimbursed for expenses that would have been paid by the Federal Government during such period had appropriations been available, including the cost of compensating such furloughed employees, together with interest; and (3) the State may use funds available to it under such Federal program to reimburse itself.

(Sec. 501) Applies the authority under this title with respect to any period in FY 1996 (not limited to periods beginning or ending after enactment of this Act) during which there occurs a lapse in appropriations with respect to any Federal department or agency which, but for such lapse, would have paid, or made reimbursement relating to, any of the expenses of the program involved.