Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/07/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/06/1996
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/11/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/14/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/18/1996
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/01/1996
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/14/1996
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/03/1996