Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/27/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/12/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/12/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/12/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/15/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/15/1996
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/18/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/19/1996
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/19/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/22/1996
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/23/1996
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 04/23/1996
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/23/1996
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/23/1996
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/23/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/24/1996
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/29/1996
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/29/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/29/1996
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/29/1996
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/08/1996
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/08/1996
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/09/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/09/1996
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/09/1996
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/16/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/16/1996
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/20/1996
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/22/1996
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/22/1996
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/22/1996
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/23/1996
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/23/1996
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 05/24/1996
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/05/1996
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/11/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/12/1996
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/27/1996