Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/20/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/20/1996
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/25/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/25/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/28/1996
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/28/1996
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/15/1996
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/15/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/15/1996
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/15/1996
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/16/1996
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 04/16/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/18/1996
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/18/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/24/1996
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/24/1996
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/30/1996
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/30/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 05/08/1996
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/13/1996