Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/19/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/19/1996
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/25/1996
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/25/1996
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/25/1996
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/25/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/16/1996
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/16/1996
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/17/1996
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/17/1996
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/30/1996
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/01/1996
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/01/1996
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/06/1996
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/06/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/20/1996
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/20/1996
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/20/1996
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/20/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/12/1996