Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/20/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/20/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/20/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/20/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/25/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/25/1996
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 04/23/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/23/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/30/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/11/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/11/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/13/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/27/1996
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/19/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/19/1996
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/27/1996