Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/21/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/21/1996
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 03/21/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/15/1996
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/07/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/07/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/09/1996
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/11/1996
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/22/1996