Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/27/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 03/27/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/15/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/15/1996
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/15/1996
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/16/1996
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/02/1996
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/02/1996
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/07/1996
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/08/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/15/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/20/1996
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/08/1996
Sen. Frahm, Sheila [R-KS] 07/25/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/24/1996
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/24/1996