Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/29/1996
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 04/22/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/23/1996
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/23/1996
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/16/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 06/27/1996
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/04/1996
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/04/1996
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/04/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/26/1996
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/26/1996
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/03/1996