Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/29/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/07/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/07/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/13/1996
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/16/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/04/1996