Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/16/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/16/1996
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/16/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 05/16/1996
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/16/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/16/1996
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/16/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/24/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/24/1996
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/06/1996
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 06/06/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/11/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/11/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 06/14/1996