Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/07/1996
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 05/07/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/23/1996
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/04/1996
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/04/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/11/1996
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 06/19/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/19/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/08/1996
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/08/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/17/1996
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 07/29/1996
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/29/1996