Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/16/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/16/1996
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/16/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/21/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/22/1996
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/04/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/04/1996
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/05/1996
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/05/1996
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/05/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 06/06/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/06/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/10/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/10/1996
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/10/1996
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/13/1996
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 07/10/1996
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/10/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/16/1996
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 08/01/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/02/1996
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/16/1996