Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/08/1996
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/09/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/09/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/09/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/09/1996
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/04/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/04/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/04/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/04/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/04/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/04/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/04/1996
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/18/1996
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 06/18/1996
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/18/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/18/1996
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/18/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/18/1996
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/18/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/11/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/23/1996
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/23/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/23/1996
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/23/1996