Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 05/23/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/29/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/03/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/04/1996
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/09/1996