Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 06/13/1996
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/13/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 06/13/1996
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 06/13/1996
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 06/13/1996
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/13/1996
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/13/1996
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/28/1996
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/28/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/28/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/18/1996
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/23/1996
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/23/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/29/1996
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/29/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/31/1996