Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 06/19/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 06/19/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 06/19/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 06/19/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/19/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/28/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/18/1996
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/23/1996
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/23/1996
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/23/1996
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/29/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/31/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/31/1996