Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/24/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/24/1996
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 06/24/1996
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/27/1996
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/28/1996
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/28/1996
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/08/1996
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/19/1996