Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 07/12/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 07/12/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/12/1996
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 07/12/1996
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 07/12/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 07/12/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 07/12/1996
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 07/12/1996
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/29/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/31/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/11/1996
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/24/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/24/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/30/1996
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/03/1996