Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 07/16/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 07/16/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/25/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/25/1996
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/25/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/25/1996
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/25/1996
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/25/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/25/1996
Sen. Frahm, Sheila [R-KS] 08/01/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/04/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/24/1996