There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

National Museum of the American Indian Act Amendments of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the National Museum of the American Indian Act to make improvements in the Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/09/1996Became Public Law No: 104-278. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1996Signed by President.
09/28/1996Presented to President.
09/26/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/05/1996Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9981-9982)
08/02/1996Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 104-350.
07/18/1996Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/09/1996Became Public Law No: 104-278. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1996Signed by President.
09/28/1996SenatePresented to President.
09/26/1996-4:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/1996-4:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/26/1996-4:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/26/1996-4:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11319)
09/26/1996-3:59pmHouseMr. Thomas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/19/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 8 - 0.
09/19/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/09/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/09/1996HouseReferred to House Resources
09/09/1996HouseReferred to House Oversight
09/09/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on House Oversight, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/09/1996-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/05/1996SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9981-9982)
08/02/1996SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
08/02/1996SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 104-350.
07/24/1996SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/18/1996SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
07/18/1996SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8157-8159)

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/18/1996
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 07/18/1996
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 07/18/1996
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/05/1996

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs07/18/1996 Referred to
07/24/1996 Markup by
08/02/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-350
House Oversight09/09/1996 Referred to
09/19/1996 Markup by
House Resources09/09/1996 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1970.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1970. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/18/1996)

National Museum of the American Indian Act Amendments of 1996 - Amends the National Museum of the American Indian Act to require the Smithsonian Institution to: (1) complete the inventory of the Indian human remains and Indian funerary objects in the possession or control of the Smithsonian Institution by June 1998; (2) provide a written summary of unassociated funerary objects, sacred objects, and objects of cultural patrimony; and (3) expedite the repatriation of such objects where a requesting Indian tribe or Native Hawaiian organization can show cultural affiliation.

Modifies certain provisions respecting the special committee to review the inventory, identification, and return of Indian human remains and Indian funerary objects.