Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 08/02/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/10/1996
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/11/1996
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/11/1996
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/11/1996
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/11/1996
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/13/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/13/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/20/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/24/1996
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/24/1996
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/24/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/25/1996
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 09/27/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/27/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/30/1996
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/01/1996