There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Capitol Guide Service to accept voluntary services.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/09/1996Became Public Law No: 104-279. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1996Signed by President.
09/28/1996Presented to President.
09/26/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/26/1996Committee on House Oversight discharged.
09/17/1996Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10723)
09/17/1996Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
10/09/1996Became Public Law No: 104-279. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1996Signed by President.
09/28/1996SenatePresented to President.
09/26/1996-7:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/1996-7:26pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
09/26/1996-7:25pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H11357)
09/26/1996-7:25pmHouseMr. Thomas asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/26/1996HouseCommittee on House Oversight discharged.
09/18/1996HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Oversight.
09/18/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/18/1996-1:55pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/17/1996SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10723)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 09/17/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight09/18/1996 Referred to
09/26/1996 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.2085.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2085. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/17/1996)

Amends the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1970 to strike provisions concerning the payment of expenses of the Capitol Guide Service (CGS) from the contingent fund of the House of Representatives until appropriations are available for such expenses.

Authorizes the CGS to accept voluntary personal services.

Prohibits: (1) persons from donating such services unless they have first agreed, in writing, to waive any claim against the United States arising out of, or in connection with, the services other than a claim for compensation for work injuries; (2) persons donating services from being considered as Federal employees other than for purposes of such compensation; and (3) such services from resulting in the reduction of pay or displacement of any CGS employee.