Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 01/12/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 01/19/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 01/19/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/03/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/13/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/15/1995