Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/13/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 01/31/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/06/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/16/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/02/1995