Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 01/13/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 01/13/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/13/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 01/19/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/01/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/10/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/23/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/26/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/21/1996