Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 01/18/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/18/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/24/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 01/24/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 01/25/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/25/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/01/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/01/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/13/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/24/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/06/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/09/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/10/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/10/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/15/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/24/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/24/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/24/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 03/27/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/31/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/04/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/06/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/06/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/27/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/27/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 04/27/1995
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/27/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/03/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/11/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/19/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/25/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/14/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/21/1995