Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 01/30/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 01/30/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 01/30/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/30/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/03/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/10/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/10/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/22/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/03/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/31/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/26/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/26/1995