Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/20/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/20/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/20/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/02/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/03/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/10/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/23/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/24/1995
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/02/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/13/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/13/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/13/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/15/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/28/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/28/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/31/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/03/1995
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/05/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/06/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/06/1995
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/06/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/25/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/27/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/09/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/11/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/11/1995
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/15/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/23/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/24/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/24/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/25/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/06/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/13/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/15/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/15/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/19/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/27/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/10/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/10/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/12/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/27/1995
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/27/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/12/1995
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/13/1995