Text: S.257 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 104-3 (03/07/1995)

 
[104th Congress Public Law 3]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ3.104]


[[Page 109 STAT. 47]]

Public Law 104-3
104th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To amend the charter of the Veterans of Foreign Wars to make eligible 
 for membership those veterans that have served within the territorial 
       limits of South Korea. <<NOTE: Mar. 7, 1995 -  [S. 257]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, That section 5 of the 
Act of May 28, 1936 (36 U.S.C. 115), is amended to read as follows:
    ``Sec. 5. A person may not be a member of the corporation created by 
this Act unless that person--
            ``(1) served honorably as a member of the Armed Forces of 
        the United States in a foreign war, insurrection, or expedition, 
        which service has been recognized as campaign-medal service and 
        is governed by the authorization of the award of a campaign 
        badge by the Government of the United States; or
            ``(2) while a member of the Armed Forces of the United 
        States, served honorably on the Korean peninsula or in its 
        territorial waters for not less than 30 consecutive days, or a 
        total of 60 days, after June 30, 1949.''.

    Approved March 7, 1995.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 257:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 141 (1995):
            Feb. 10, considered and passed Senate.
            Feb. 28, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>