Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/07/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/13/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/15/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/15/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/15/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/15/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 02/15/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/15/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/15/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/15/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/15/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/15/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/15/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/15/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/15/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/15/1995
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 02/15/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/15/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/15/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/15/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/15/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/16/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/22/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/14/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/16/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/16/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/06/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/07/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/24/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew