Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/31/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/31/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 01/31/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/31/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/31/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/31/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/03/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/03/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/13/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/22/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/03/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 03/07/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/30/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/03/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/05/1995