Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/01/1995
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/01/1995
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 02/01/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/01/1995
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/02/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/03/1995
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/05/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 11/28/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/28/1995