Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 02/03/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/13/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/13/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/13/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/13/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/15/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/15/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/16/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/16/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/22/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/22/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/08/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/30/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/30/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/25/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/26/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/15/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/20/1995
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/07/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/25/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/01/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/27/1996