Committees: S.4 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Budget01/04/1995 Referred to
01/18/1995 Hearings by
02/14/1995 Markup by
02/27/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-9
Senate Governmental Affairs01/04/1995 Referred to
02/23/1995 Hearings by
03/02/1995 Markup by
03/07/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-13