Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/13/1995
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/13/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/21/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/21/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/23/1995
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 03/23/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/05/1995
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/05/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/05/1995
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/06/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/06/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/25/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/26/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/03/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/03/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/05/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/11/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/15/1995