Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/03/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/27/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/28/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/29/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/29/1995