Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/16/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/29/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/29/1995
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/19/1995
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/23/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/09/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/14/1995